OK SB300 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB300
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the COVID-19 Public Health Emergency Limited Liability Act. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the COVID-19 Public Health Emergency Limited Liability Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendment (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendment (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2020 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted AYES: 38 NAYS: 9 |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fugate |
2020-05-04 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2020-05-04 | House | Emergency added |
2020-05-04 | House | Amended |
2020-05-04 | House | General Order |
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative O'Donnell (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB300 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary