OK SB27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB27
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency child placement; defining term. Effective date.
Title
Emergency child placement; defining term. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB27 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021