OK SB267 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher retirement; authorizing retired members to return with no earnings limitations for certain period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher retirement; authorizing retired members to return with no earnings limitations for certain period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseCR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
2021-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
2021-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-22SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
2021-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2021-02-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Jech
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Pemberton
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb267&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB267%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB267%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB267%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB267%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB267%20FA1%20NOLLANJA-AMM(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB267%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/oplaa%20actuarial/Senate/SB267%20INT%20AO.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB267%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB267_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB267_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback