OK SB267 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; modifying purposes for which Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund earnings may be spent. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; modifying purposes for which Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund earnings may be spent. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-07 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | |
2009-05-06 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-20 | HAs read | |
2009-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6 | |
2009-04-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2009-04-16 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Title restored | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | |
2009-02-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Cox (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Cox | |
2009-02-04 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |