OK SB266 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB266
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Real Estate License Code; broker license; registrations; fee. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Real Estate License Code; broker license; registrations; fee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2017-04-12 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jordan |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB266 (Carry Over) 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 838 | 303A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 858 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 858 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 858 | 303 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 858 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text |