OK SB257 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Career and technology education; authorizing transfer of surplus property from one district to another or to the Oklahoma Department of Career and Technology Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Career and technology education; authorizing transfer of surplus property from one district to another or to the Oklahoma Department of Career and Technology Education. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Corn [D] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-07 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-14 | HAs read | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 3 | |
2009-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Fields | |
2009-04-13 | General Order | |
2009-04-02 | Title restored | |
2009-04-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Denney | |
2009-02-04 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Corn | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |