OK SB251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB251
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Vetoed 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Vetoed 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical expense recovery; requiring Oklahoma Health Care Authority to use third party to handle certain processes related to medical expense recovery. Effective date.
Title
Medical expense recovery; requiring Oklahoma Health Care Authority to use third party to handle certain processes related to medical expense recovery. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vetoed 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 26 |
2019-04-22 | House | General Order |
2019-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative O'Donnell (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB251 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Vetoed 05/14/2019