OK SB224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB224
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement training; modifying authority of the Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement training; modifying authority of the Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Johns (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB224 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019