OK SB2215 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sex Offenders Registration Act; expanding scope of Act; modify procedures. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sex Offenders Registration Act; expanding scope of Act; modify procedures. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-29 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-08 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Senator Sykes | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Nelson | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-12 | Pending removal author Senator Bingman and replace with Senator Sykes | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-02-10 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-09 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-08 | Pending removal author Senator Bingman and replace with Senator Lamb | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 217 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 582 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 583 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 584 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 585 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 590 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |