OK SB218 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Practice of psychology; removing certain limitation on appointees to the State Board of Examiners in Psychology. Effective date.
Title
Practice of psychology; removing certain limitation on appointees to the State Board of Examiners in Psychology. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 33 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |