OK SB217 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB217
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offender registration; level assignment categorizations; reporting procedures. Effective date.
Title
Sex offender registration; level assignment categorizations; reporting procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-13 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2017-04-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2017-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB217 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017