OK SB214 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax administration; deleting certain provisions and qualifications related to Ad Valorem Division; conforming language. Effective date.
Title
Tax administration; deleting certain provisions and qualifications related to Ad Valorem Division; conforming language. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |