OK SB2126 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Corrections; appropriation. Emergency.
Title
Department of Corrections; appropriation. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23; Ayes: 81 Nays: 8 |
2014-05-13 | House | JCR adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | Considered |
2014-05-12 | House | Laid over |
2014-05-13 | House | General Order |
2014-05-07 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2014-05-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-27 | Senate | coauthored by Sears |
2014-03-27 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | coauthored by Justice |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2014-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |