OK SB210 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB210
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; credits; North American Industry Classification System; formula. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; credits; North American Industry Classification System; formula. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Haste [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-25 | Senate | SCs named Haste, Jech, Rader, Howard, Daniels, Montgomery, Kirt, Dugger |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2023-05-17 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2023-05-10 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 3 |
2023-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Luttrell |
2023-04-20 | House | General Order |
2023-04-13 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Haste |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Conferees unable to agree