OK SB210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB210
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pay for Success Act; providing for agency contracts for reimbursement; creating fund. Effective date.
Title
Pay for Success Act; providing for agency contracts for reimbursement; creating fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] |
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] | Sen. Carri Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shaw |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee