OK SB2093 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - 2 CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - 2 CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Trespassing; making shooting from a public road or highway onto the land of another a trespass. Effective date.
Title
Trespassing; making shooting from a public road or highway onto the land of another a trespass. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-18 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-18 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-13 | CCR read | |
2010-05-05 | Conference granted, HC's named Sanders, Duncan, Terrill, Inman, Lamons | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Sparks, Schulz, Justice, Reynolds, Marlatt, Ellis | |
2010-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-06 | Title restored | |
2010-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sanders | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sparks | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1835 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 7 | 209 | New Code | See Bill Text |