OK SB2092 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-24 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county government; authorizing the adoption of certain principles which foster cooperation among certain persons; modifying purposes in which resale property fund may be expended. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county government; authorizing the adoption of certain principles which foster cooperation among certain persons; modifying purposes in which resale property fund may be expended. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read | |
2010-05-11 | Conference granted, HC's named Richardson, Billy, Johnson, Martin (Scott), Shoemake, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-05-11 | SCs named Sparks, Aldridge, Johnson (Mike), Bingman, Crain, Nichols, Ballenger | |
2010-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 17 | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | Title restored | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Richardson (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Richardson | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sparks | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1402 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1405 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 3137 | New Code | See Bill Text |