OK SB2057 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agency Consolidation Act of 2014; Advantage Waiver and Developmental Disability Services Rate Review Committee. Effective date.
Title
Agency Consolidation Act of 2014; Advantage Waiver and Developmental Disability Services Rate Review Committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-14 | House | General Order |
2014-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Bingman; authored by Griffin |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |