OK SB200 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Labor; providing for schedule of administrative fines; modifying provisions relating to elevator inspections and standards. Effective date.
Title
Department of Labor; providing for schedule of administrative fines; modifying provisions relating to elevator inspections and standards. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 18 |
2016-04-12 | House | General Order |
2016-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 141 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 141 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 405 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3023 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3023 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3023 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3023 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3023 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3023 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |