OK SB1946 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil liability; establishing immunity in certain civil actions; establishing applicability. Emergency.
Title
Civil liability; establishing immunity in certain civil actions; establishing applicability. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20 |
2020-05-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell, Lepak |
2020-05-14 | House | General Order |
2020-05-13 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-05-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 |
2020-05-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2020-05-06 | Senate | First Reading |