OK SB1943 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Fireworks display; directing delivery of certain license copies to Office of the State Fire Marshal. Emergency.
Title
Fireworks display; directing delivery of certain license copies to Office of the State Fire Marshal. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 9 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 9 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 50) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 54 Nays: 4 | |
2012-05-25 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2 | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 65 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-18 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-17 | CCR read | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named Anderson, Barrington, Fields, Crain, Bass, Ballenger | |
2012-04-25 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-16 | HAs read | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 5 | |
2012-04-12 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |