OK SB1943 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - coauthored by Russ (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - coauthored by Russ (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; allowing board of education of a school district to transfer monies in general fund to building fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; allowing board of education of a school district to transfer monies in general fund to building fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Russ (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Russ | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1943&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb1943_int.rtf |