OK SB1922 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General appropriations; making appropriations to various agencies; providing for certain transfers of funds. Effective date.
Title
General appropriations; making appropriations to various agencies; providing for certain transfers of funds. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2020-05-13 | House | To Senate |
2020-05-13 | House | Veto overridden: Ayes: 79 Nays: 20 |
2020-05-13 | House | Veto override message received |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Vetoed 05/13/2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 23 |
2020-05-07 | House | JCR adopted |
2020-05-07 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2020-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |