OK SB191 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB191
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Open Records Act; records; specifying requirement for permissible delay for certain requests. Effective date.
Title
Open Records Act; records; specifying requirement for permissible delay for certain requests. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Brumbaugh (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB191 (Carry Over) 2017-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2017