OK SB191 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Dependent insurance coverage; modifying definition of dependent for purposes of the State and Education Employees Group Insurance Act. Emergency.
Title
Dependent insurance coverage; modifying definition of dependent for purposes of the State and Education Employees Group Insurance Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Motion expired | |
2011-03-08 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2011-03-03 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Aldridge | |
2011-03-03 | Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 9 | |
2011-03-03 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Key (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1303 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1309 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |