OK SB1900 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; requires entities issuing permit to verify payment of sales and use taxes. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; requires entities issuing permit to verify payment of sales and use taxes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] | Rep. Wallace Collins [D] |
Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Terry Harrison [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Rep. Tad Jones [R] | Rep. Ryan Kiesel [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-20 | Title restored | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Jett, Johnson, Banz, Blackwell, Proctor, Morgan, Kiesel, Walker | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 | |
2010-04-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Kiesel | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jett | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 56 | |
2010-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Collins, Tibbs | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Harrison | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, General Government Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | coauthored by Jones | |
2010-03-02 | coauthored by Barrington | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-01 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Jones | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Jett (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Burrage, Gumm | |
2010-02-10 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Jett | |
2010-02-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-09 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Gumm | |
2010-02-08 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Burrage | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 43 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 241 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |