OK SB187 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB187
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; removing and adding facilities within the Department. Effective date.
Title
Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; removing and adding facilities within the Department. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-20 | House | General Order |
2021-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB187 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2021