OK SB187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor 04/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sheriffs; authorizing sheriff to perform certain duties. Effective date.
Title
Sheriffs; authorizing sheriff to perform certain duties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor 04/06/2011 | |
2011-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-03-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-30 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Sanders (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |