OK SB1843 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax; modifying payroll allocation for taxable income to include home office workers in this state. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; modifying payroll allocation for taxable income to include home office workers in this state. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |