OK SB1829 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; directing the State Regents for Higher Education to adopt certain tuition policy. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; directing the State Regents for Higher Education to adopt certain tuition policy. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Higher Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Virgin |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |