OK SB1822 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; requiring signage be placed on certain projects funded by the Joint Committee on Pandemic Relief Funding; implementation; responsibilities. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; requiring signage be placed on certain projects funded by the Joint Committee on Pandemic Relief Funding; implementation; responsibilities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 32 |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2022-04-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative Munson |
2022-04-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-04-12 | House | Withdrawn from General Government Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |