OK SB18 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB18
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - coauthored by McDugle
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - coauthored by McDugle
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; directing certain protection of rights. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; directing certain protection of rights. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2021-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Gann |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB18 (Carry Over) 2021-02-15 - coauthored by McDugle