OK SB18 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - coauthored by McDugle
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; directing certain protection of rights. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; directing certain protection of rights. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15Senatecoauthored by McDugle
2021-02-10Senatecoauthored by Gann
2021-02-09SenateCoauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback