OK SB1713 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating certain memorial highways. Effective date.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating certain memorial highways. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Samson Buck [D] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-26 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-08 | HAs read | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2010-04-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-04-07 | General Order | |
2010-03-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-02-11 | coauthored by Buck (principal House author) | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Buck | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Gumm | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |