OK SB171 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB171
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Weaver
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Weaver
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement training; allowing certain military certification by CLEET. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement training; allowing certain military certification by CLEET. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] |
Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Weaver |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Weaver