OK SB1704 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging, and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency
Title
Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging, and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Approved by Governor 04/04/2012 | |
2012-03-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-03-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-03-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-28 | General Order | |
2012-03-27 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-07 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-02-06 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 460 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1835 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 7 | 209 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1435 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 161 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 36 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |