OK SB169 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring certain law enforcement and emergency medical service providers to be present for a security drill. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring certain law enforcement and emergency medical service providers to be present for a security drill. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gollihare |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB169 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Common Education