OK SB1659 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to the Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying definitions; modifying compensation for overtime; modifying authorization for salary and other adjustments. Effective date.
Title
State government; relating to the Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying definitions; modifying compensation for overtime; modifying authorization for salary and other adjustments. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-21 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | Laid over | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Title restored | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-10 | coauthored by Wright (John) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-10 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-10 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-08 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-04 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Wright (John) | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 840 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |