OK SB1655 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; removing requirement to publish certain district-level data.
Title
Schools; removing requirement to publish certain district-level data.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 27; Ayes: 42 Nays: 33 |
2014-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 541 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 545 | New Code | See Bill Text |