OK SB1644 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - coauthored by Fields
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - coauthored by Fields
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Wildlife Conservation; keeping certain information confidential. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Department of Wildlife Conservation; keeping certain information confidential. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1644&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb1644_int.rtf |