OK SB1642 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying procedure for appointing insurance producer as an agent. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Insurance; modifying procedure for appointing insurance producer as an agent. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/18/2020 |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-11 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Insurance, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |