OK SB164 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB164
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical care; modifying provisions related to informed consent to experimental treatment. Effective date.
Title
Medical care; modifying provisions related to informed consent to experimental treatment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 |
2021-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB164 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021