OK SB1635 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; requiring an affidavit for license renewal under certain circumstance; testing. Emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; requiring an affidavit for license renewal under certain circumstance; testing. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-25 | House | Amended |
2024-04-25 | House | General Order |
2024-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-04-11 | House | Title restored |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Emergency added |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |