OK SB1627 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Energy; creating the Oklahoma Energy Initiative; stating purpose. Emergency.
Title
Energy; creating the Oklahoma Energy Initiative; stating purpose. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Approved by Governor 05/14/2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-07 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-25 | HAs read | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 23 | |
2012-04-24 | General Order | |
2012-04-04 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Title restored | |
2012-03-12 | coauthored by Fields | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-06 | coauthored by Peters (principal House author) | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 802 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 802 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 802 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 802 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |