OK SB1624 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; clarifying qualifications for reduced registration fee for certain military personnel. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; clarifying qualifications for reduced registration fee for certain military personnel. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue, Taxation, and Employee Compensation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2014-05-22SenateHAs adopted
2014-04-16SenateHAs read
2014-04-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1
2014-04-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2014-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-07HouseTitle restored
2014-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2014-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2014-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2014-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-02-13SenateGeneral Order, considered and deferred
2014-02-04SenateTitle stricken
2014-02-04SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2014-02-04Senatecoauthored by Hardin (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Simpson
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback