OK SB1620 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drugs; creating the Oklahoma Right to Know Act; authorizing persons to request certain information on drug pricing. Effective date.
Title
Prescription drugs; creating the Oklahoma Right to Know Act; authorizing persons to request certain information on drug pricing. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |