OK SB1610 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fees; modifying fees assessed in certain criminal and juvenile cases. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees; modifying fees assessed in certain criminal and juvenile cases. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-26SenateSent to Governor
2016-05-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 28; Ayes: 73 Nays: 21
2016-05-25HouseJCR adopted
2016-05-25HouseGeneral Order
2016-05-24HouseSecond Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2016-05-23HouseFirst Reading
2016-05-23SenateEngrossed to House
2016-05-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-05-23SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
2016-05-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12
2016-05-23SenateJCR adopted
2016-05-17SenateReported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2016-05-17SenateSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-16Senatecoauthored by Casey
2016-05-16Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2016-05-16Senatecoauthored by Treat
2016-05-16SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2016-05-16SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback