OK SB1603 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Regional water planning groups; creating Regional Water Planning Act; creating Regional Water Planning Councils; Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Regional water planning groups; creating Regional Water Planning Act; creating Regional Water Planning Councils; Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Fields | |
2012-03-13 | Measure failed: Ayes: 15 Nays: 25 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-20 | coauthored by Richardson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-20 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Fields | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |