OK SB1599 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of State; modifying positions in unclassified service. Effective date.
Title
Secretary of State; modifying positions in unclassified service. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 44 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/24/2016 |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 28; Ayes: 44 Nays: 35 |
2016-05-19 | House | JCR adopted |
2016-05-19 | House | General Order |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2016-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Casey |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-05-11 | Senate | First Reading |