OK SB1587 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Electric Vehicle Charging Act; modifying definitions; clarifying application and implementation of act. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Electric Vehicle Charging Act; modifying definitions; clarifying application and implementation of act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Jared Deck [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 6 |
2024-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-04-23 | House | General Order |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2024-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |